THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 05:21:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: Parsons, Patrick David (Used Until: 23 May 2021)
Medical School: McMaster University, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 725 Bronte St S
Milton District Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
Milton ON L9T 9K1
Phone: (905) 878-2383
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100-3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 1M1
Phone: ‭(437) 291-8555‬
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. DAVID PARSONS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jan 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Parsons (CPSO#: 109166 )
Business Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Business Address: 725 Bronte St S
Milton ON L9T 9K1

General Information

Former Name: Parsons, Patrick David (Used Until: 23 May 2021)
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 725 Bronte St S
Milton District Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
Milton ON L9T 9K1
Phone: (905) 878-2383
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100-3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 1M1
Phone: ‭(437) 291-8555‬
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. DAVID PARSONS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jan 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Parsons (CPSO#: 109166 )
Business Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Business Address: 725 Bronte St S
Milton ON L9T 9K1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID PATRICK PARSONS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARSONS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID PATRICK PARSONS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARSONS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016