THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:22:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055212100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 16 Oct 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Dec 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 16 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vera Ivanenko Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Apr 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Ivanenko (CPSO#: 109174 )
Business Address: Brant Community Healthcare System
The Brantford General Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
(519) 752-7871
Business Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 0L8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055212100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 16 Oct 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Dec 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 16 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vera Ivanenko Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Apr 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Ivanenko (CPSO#: 109174 )
Business Address: Brant Community Healthcare System
The Brantford General Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
(519) 752-7871
Business Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 0L8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VERA IVANENKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IVANENKO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VERA IVANENKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IVANENKO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Other
Effective Date: 06 Sep 2024
Summary:
Charges

Vera Ivanenko was charged with the following offences:

1.  2 counts of Assault With a Weapon, on or about January 30, 2020 and on or about August 14, 2024, contrary to section 267(a) of the of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Date of Charge:  September 6, 2024 
Place of Charge:  Hamilton, Ontario
Ontario Provincial Police


Source: Other
Effective Date: 14 Aug 2024
Summary:
Release Conditions

On August 14, 2024, the following Release Conditions were imposed on Vera Ivanenko:

1.  Ivanenko must notify Police of any change of address.
2.  Ivanenko must not communicate, directly or indirectly, with named person except with specified conditions.
3.  Ivanenko must not go to specified address except with specified condition.
4.  Ivanenko must not enter areas within 50 meters of any place where Ivanenko knows specified person to live, work, go to school, frequent or any place Ivanenko knows specified person to be except for required court appearances.
5.  Ivanenko must reside at specified address and must present themselves at the entrance of that residence when a peace officer requests they do so.
6.  Ivanenko must not possess a firearm, crossbow, prohibited weapon, restricted weapon, prohibited device, ammunition, prohibited ammunition or explosive substance, and must surrender those that are in her possession and also any authorization, licence or registration certificate or other document enabling her to acquire or possess them.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Other
Effective Date: 06 Sep 2024
Summary:
Charges

Vera Ivanenko was charged with the following offences:

1.  2 counts of Assault With a Weapon, on or about January 30, 2020 and on or about August 14, 2024, contrary to section 267(a) of the of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Date of Charge:  September 6, 2024 
Place of Charge:  Hamilton, Ontario
Ontario Provincial Police


Source: Other
Effective Date: 14 Aug 2024
Summary:
Release Conditions

On August 14, 2024, the following Release Conditions were imposed on Vera Ivanenko:

1.  Ivanenko must notify Police of any change of address.
2.  Ivanenko must not communicate, directly or indirectly, with named person except with specified conditions.
3.  Ivanenko must not go to specified address except with specified condition.
4.  Ivanenko must not enter areas within 50 meters of any place where Ivanenko knows specified person to live, work, go to school, frequent or any place Ivanenko knows specified person to be except for required court appearances.
5.  Ivanenko must reside at specified address and must present themselves at the entrance of that residence when a peace officer requests they do so.
6.  Ivanenko must not possess a firearm, crossbow, prohibited weapon, restricted weapon, prohibited device, ammunition, prohibited ammunition or explosive substance, and must surrender those that are in her possession and also any authorization, licence or registration certificate or other document enabling her to acquire or possess them.

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Feb 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016