THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:15:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4 Campbell Drive
Uxbridge Hospital
Uxbridge Ontario L9P 1S4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 852-9771
Fax: 1-833-222-7279

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority Moose Factory
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Area Health Authority
LOCATION: Moose Factory

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Carina Hoang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Feb 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Hoang (CPSO#: 109178 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE
Medical School: McMaster University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4 Campbell Drive
Uxbridge Hospital
Uxbridge Ontario L9P 1S4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 852-9771
Fax: 1-833-222-7279

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority Moose Factory
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Area Health Authority
LOCATION: Moose Factory

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Carina Hoang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Feb 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Hoang (CPSO#: 109178 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CARINA HOANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CARINA HOANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Sep 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016