THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:09:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, UKRAINIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1Y3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055221155
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 May 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Grimsby

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Darya Kurowecki Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Dec 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Kurowecki (CPSO#: 109183 )
Business Address: 200 James Street South
#305
SUGO - Specialized Ultrasound in Gynecology & Obstetrics
Hamilton Ontario L8P 3A9
905 522-2220
Business Address: 1144 Wilson Street West
Suite 104
Imagus Inc. o/a Ancaster X-Ray & Ultrasound
Hamilton Ontario L9G 3K9
905-648-5900
Business Address: g2-25 Charlton Avenue East
Imagus Inc. o/a Charlton X-Ray & Ultrasound X-Ray & Ultrasound
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1Y2
905-528-1465
Business Address: 50 Charlton Avenue East
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton, Charlton Campus
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
905-522-1155
Business Address: 2757 King Street East
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton, King Campus
Hamilton Ontario L8G 5E4
905-522-1155
Business Address: 100 West 5th Street
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton, West 5th Campus
Hamilton Ontario L9C 0E3
905-522-1155

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, UKRAINIAN
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1Y3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055221155
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 May 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Grimsby

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Darya Kurowecki Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Dec 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Kurowecki (CPSO#: 109183 )
Business Address: 200 James Street South
#305
SUGO - Specialized Ultrasound in Gynecology & Obstetrics
Hamilton Ontario L8P 3A9
905 522-2220
Business Address: 1144 Wilson Street West
Suite 104
Imagus Inc. o/a Ancaster X-Ray & Ultrasound
Hamilton Ontario L9G 3K9
905-648-5900
Business Address: g2-25 Charlton Avenue East
Imagus Inc. o/a Charlton X-Ray & Ultrasound X-Ray & Ultrasound
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1Y2
905-528-1465
Business Address: 50 Charlton Avenue East
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton, Charlton Campus
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
905-522-1155
Business Address: 2757 King Street East
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton, King Campus
Hamilton Ontario L8G 5E4
905-522-1155
Business Address: 100 West 5th Street
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton, West 5th Campus
Hamilton Ontario L9C 0E3
905-522-1155

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DARYA KUROWECKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUROWECKI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DARYA KUROWECKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUROWECKI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Mar 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Mar 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016