THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 06:31:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501 Smyth Rd
The Ottawa Hospital- General Campus
Division of Palliative Care
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-737-8899
Extension: 78940
Fax: 613-739-6182

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. RAYAN DELBANI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jan 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Delbani (CPSO#: 109184 )
Business Address: 501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
(613) 798-5555

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501 Smyth Rd
The Ottawa Hospital- General Campus
Division of Palliative Care
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-737-8899
Extension: 78940
Fax: 613-739-6182

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. RAYAN DELBANI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jan 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Delbani (CPSO#: 109184 )
Business Address: 501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
(613) 798-5555

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAYAN DELBANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DELBANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAYAN DELBANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DELBANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 06 May 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 06 May 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016