THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:58:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sherbourne Health Centre
LGBTQ Health Team, 2nd floor
333 Sherbourne St
Toronto Ontario M5A 2S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 324-4100
Fax: (416) 324-4181

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Goodridge Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Apr 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Goodridge (CPSO#: 109199 )
Business Address: Sherbourne Health Centre
LGBTQ Health Team
2nd Floor
333 Sherbourne Street
Toronto Ontario M5A 2S5
(416) 324-4100 Extn: 3287
Business Address: 200-66 Gerrard Street East
Toronto Ontario M5B 1G3
(416) 922-0566

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sherbourne Health Centre
LGBTQ Health Team, 2nd floor
333 Sherbourne St
Toronto Ontario M5A 2S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 324-4100
Fax: (416) 324-4181

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Goodridge Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Apr 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Goodridge (CPSO#: 109199 )
Business Address: Sherbourne Health Centre
LGBTQ Health Team
2nd Floor
333 Sherbourne Street
Toronto Ontario M5A 2S5
(416) 324-4100 Extn: 3287
Business Address: 200-66 Gerrard Street East
Toronto Ontario M5B 1G3
(416) 922-0566

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JORDAN DANIEL GOODRIDGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOODRIDGE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JORDAN DANIEL GOODRIDGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOODRIDGE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016