THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:47:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 1800 Stn Main
Markham Stouffville Hospital
Department of Medicine, Division of Critical Care
Markham ON L3P 7P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054727373
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 24 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Mikhaeil Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jan 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mikhaeil (CPSO#: 109202 )
Business Address: 4890 Forest Hill Dr
Mississauga ON L5M 5B1
Business Address: 34 Owen Dr
Etobicoke ON M8W 1W7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 1800 Stn Main
Markham Stouffville Hospital
Department of Medicine, Division of Critical Care
Markham ON L3P 7P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054727373
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 24 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Mikhaeil Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jan 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mikhaeil (CPSO#: 109202 )
Business Address: 4890 Forest Hill Dr
Mississauga ON L5M 5B1
Business Address: 34 Owen Dr
Etobicoke ON M8W 1W7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL SAMI GAMIL MIKHAEIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIKHAEIL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL SAMI GAMIL MIKHAEIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIKHAEIL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Oct 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016