THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:18:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101-60 Bowes St
Parry Sound ON P2A 2L3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-746-9382
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Mar 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 08 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound
Kirkland and District Hospital Kirkland Lake
HOSPITAL: West Parry Sound Health Centre
LOCATION: Parry Sound

HOSPITAL: Kirkland and District Hospital
LOCATION: Kirkland Lake

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. K. KNIGHT MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jul 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Knight (CPSO#: 109204 )
Business Address: 60 Bowes Street
Unit 101
Parry Sound Ontario P2A 2L3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101-60 Bowes St
Parry Sound ON P2A 2L3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-746-9382
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Mar 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 08 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound
Kirkland and District Hospital Kirkland Lake
HOSPITAL: West Parry Sound Health Centre
LOCATION: Parry Sound

HOSPITAL: Kirkland and District Hospital
LOCATION: Kirkland Lake

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. K. KNIGHT MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jul 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Knight (CPSO#: 109204 )
Business Address: 60 Bowes Street
Unit 101
Parry Sound Ontario P2A 2L3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATHERINE HEATHER MICHELLE KNIGHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KNIGHT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATHERINE HEATHER MICHELLE KNIGHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KNIGHT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Mar 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Mar 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Mar 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016