THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 04:19:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1000 Depalma Dr
Northumberland Hills Hospital
Cobourg ON K9A 5W6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 372-6811
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound
HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

HOSPITAL: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Campbellford

HOSPITAL: West Parry Sound Health Centre
LOCATION: Parry Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kaylin Woods Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Apr 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Woods (CPSO#: 109220 )
Business Address: 6 Albert Street
Parry Sound Ontario P2A 3A4
(705) 207-8672
Business Address: 1000 Depalma Drive
Cobourg Ontario K9A 5W6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1000 Depalma Dr
Northumberland Hills Hospital
Cobourg ON K9A 5W6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 372-6811
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound
HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

HOSPITAL: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Campbellford

HOSPITAL: West Parry Sound Health Centre
LOCATION: Parry Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kaylin Woods Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Apr 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Woods (CPSO#: 109220 )
Business Address: 6 Albert Street
Parry Sound Ontario P2A 3A4
(705) 207-8672
Business Address: 1000 Depalma Drive
Cobourg Ontario K9A 5W6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAYLIN ELIZABETH WOODS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOODS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAYLIN ELIZABETH WOODS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOODS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Apr 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016