THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:12:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Health for All
Family Health Team
202 - 379 Church St
Markham Ontario L6B 0T1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 472-2200
Fax: 9054725662

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Megan Tan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Apr 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Tan (CPSO#: 109239 )
Business Address: Health for All Family Health Team
379 Church Street
Suite 202
Markham Ontario L6B 0T1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Health for All
Family Health Team
202 - 379 Church St
Markham Ontario L6B 0T1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 472-2200
Fax: 9054725662

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Megan Tan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Apr 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Tan (CPSO#: 109239 )
Business Address: Health for All Family Health Team
379 Church Street
Suite 202
Markham Ontario L6B 0T1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEGAN CIARA TAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEGAN CIARA TAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016