THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:17:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1261 Beaverbrook Ave
London ON N6H 0G6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-432-4107
Fax: 519-432-6921

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Castronovo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 May 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Castronovo (CPSO#: 109243 )
Business Address: London Family Health Team
1 - 1261 Beaverbrook Avenue
London Ontario N6H 0G6
(519) 642-2077

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1261 Beaverbrook Ave
London ON N6H 0G6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-432-4107
Fax: 519-432-6921

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Castronovo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 May 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Castronovo (CPSO#: 109243 )
Business Address: London Family Health Team
1 - 1261 Beaverbrook Avenue
London Ontario N6H 0G6
(519) 642-2077

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VENERA CRISTINA CASTRONOVO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CASTRONOVO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VENERA CRISTINA CASTRONOVO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CASTRONOVO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016