THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 05:12:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-883-1212
Extension: 2104
Fax: 1-833-390-1633
Address: 9383 Islington Ave
Hospice Vaughan
Woodbridge ON L4H 3G7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Palliative Medicine
Effective: 08 Sep 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Palliative Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 08 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: YIFAN LI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Li (CPSO#: 109248 )
Business Address: 10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
905-850-5001 Extn: 5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-883-1212
Extension: 2104
Fax: 1-833-390-1633
Address: 9383 Islington Ave
Hospice Vaughan
Woodbridge ON L4H 3G7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Palliative Medicine
Effective: 08 Sep 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Palliative Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 08 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: YIFAN LI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Li (CPSO#: 109248 )
Business Address: 10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
905-850-5001 Extn: 5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YIFAN LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YIFAN LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Feb 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016