THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/05/25 04:48:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1030 Ouellette Ave
Windsor Regional Hospital
Critical Care
Windsor ON N9A 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-254-5577
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 194 Talbot Street West
Erie Shores HealthCare Hospital
Critical Care
Leamington Ontario N8H 3X2
Phone: 519) 326-2373
Extension: ICU
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 310 Juliana Dr
Woodstock Hospital
Critical Care
Woodstock ON N4V 0A4
Phone: 519-421-4211
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 20 Sep 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Blaszak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Dec 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Blaszak (CPSO#: 109250 )
Business Address: 250 Pall Mall Street
Unit 1004
London Ontario N6A 6K3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1030 Ouellette Ave
Windsor Regional Hospital
Critical Care
Windsor ON N9A 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-254-5577
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 194 Talbot Street West
Erie Shores HealthCare Hospital
Critical Care
Leamington Ontario N8H 3X2
Phone: 519) 326-2373
Extension: ICU
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 310 Juliana Dr
Woodstock Hospital
Critical Care
Woodstock ON N4V 0A4
Phone: 519-421-4211
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 20 Sep 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Blaszak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Dec 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Blaszak (CPSO#: 109250 )
Business Address: 250 Pall Mall Street
Unit 1004
London Ontario N6A 6K3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL ANDREW BLASZAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLASZAK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL ANDREW BLASZAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLASZAK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 04 Sep 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Sep 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Sep 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 04 Sep 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016