THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:46:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2338 Hurontario St
suite 102C
Mississauga ON L5B 1N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6477225912
Fax: 4169870099

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 01 Oct 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Coomes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Aug 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Coomes (CPSO#: 109256 )
Business Address: 2338 Hurontario St
unit 102 C
Mississauga ON L5B 1N1
Business Address: 500-2275 Lake Shore Blvd W
Etobicoke ON M8V 3Y3
6472893368

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2338 Hurontario St
suite 102C
Mississauga ON L5B 1N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6477225912
Fax: 4169870099

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 01 Oct 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Coomes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Aug 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Coomes (CPSO#: 109256 )
Business Address: 2338 Hurontario St
unit 102 C
Mississauga ON L5B 1N1
Business Address: 500-2275 Lake Shore Blvd W
Etobicoke ON M8V 3Y3
6472893368

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERIC ANTHONY COOMES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COOMES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERIC ANTHONY COOMES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COOMES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016