THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:37:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN, TAIWANESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 198 Des Newman Boulevard
Whitby Health Centre
Oshawa Clinic Group
3rd Floor
Whitby Ontario L1P 1Y5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-721-3586
Fax: 905-721-6676

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Li Hao Chen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jul 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Chen (CPSO#: 109261 )
Business Address: Oshawa Clinic
3F
117 King Street East
Oshawa Ontario L1H 1B9
905-721-3586
Business Address: 198 Des Newman Boulevard
3D
Whitby Ontario L1P 0P9
905-721-3586

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN, TAIWANESE
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 198 Des Newman Boulevard
Whitby Health Centre
Oshawa Clinic Group
3rd Floor
Whitby Ontario L1P 1Y5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-721-3586
Fax: 905-721-6676

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Li Hao Chen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jul 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Chen (CPSO#: 109261 )
Business Address: Oshawa Clinic
3F
117 King Street East
Oshawa Ontario L1H 1B9
905-721-3586
Business Address: 198 Des Newman Boulevard
3D
Whitby Ontario L1P 0P9
905-721-3586

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LI HAO CHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LI HAO CHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016