THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:45:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough Centenary Hospital
Galaxy 12 Teen Clinic
Scarborough ON M1E 4B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-281-7476
Fax: 416-281-7313
Address: 622 Bloor St W
Bloor Kids
Toronto ON M6G 1K7
Phone: 6474831502
Fax: 6474800909
Address: 80 Workman Way
Centre for Addiction and Mental Health
Garron Family Building
Toronto ON M6J 1H4
Phone: 4165358501
Extension: 32820
Fax: 416-979-4996

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Adolescent Medicine
Effective: 08 Oct 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 11 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Adolescent Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 08 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. G. McSheffrey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. G. McSheffrey (CPSO#: 109273 )
Business Address: 622 Bloor Street West
Toronto Ontario M6G 1K7
6474831502

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough Centenary Hospital
Galaxy 12 Teen Clinic
Scarborough ON M1E 4B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-281-7476
Fax: 416-281-7313
Address: 622 Bloor St W
Bloor Kids
Toronto ON M6G 1K7
Phone: 6474831502
Fax: 6474800909
Address: 80 Workman Way
Centre for Addiction and Mental Health
Garron Family Building
Toronto ON M6J 1H4
Phone: 4165358501
Extension: 32820
Fax: 416-979-4996

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Adolescent Medicine
Effective: 08 Oct 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 11 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Adolescent Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 08 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. G. McSheffrey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. G. McSheffrey (CPSO#: 109273 )
Business Address: 622 Bloor Street West
Toronto Ontario M6G 1K7
6474831502

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GORDON GERALD MCSHEFFREY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCSHEFFREY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GORDON GERALD MCSHEFFREY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCSHEFFREY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016