THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 06:10:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: Van, Binh Le (Used Until: 21 Apr 2022)
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1001 Queen St W
Toronto ON M6J 1H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-535-8501
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 02 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 02 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lily Van Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jan 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Van (CPSO#: 109283 )
Business Address: 1001 Queen St W
Toronto ON M6J 1H4
416-535-8501

General Information

Former Name: Van, Binh Le (Used Until: 21 Apr 2022)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1001 Queen St W
Toronto ON M6J 1H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-535-8501
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 02 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 02 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lily Van Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jan 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Van (CPSO#: 109283 )
Business Address: 1001 Queen St W
Toronto ON M6J 1H4
416-535-8501

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LILY BINH-LE VAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LILY BINH-LE VAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 May 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 May 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016