THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:28:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3050 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough Health Network
General Campus
Scarborough ON M1P 2V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-438-2911
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 318-3030 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough ON M1P 2T7
Phone: (416) 289-2166
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: GUAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Guan (CPSO#: 109295 )
Business Address: 3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Health Network
General Campus
Toronto Ontario M1P 2V5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3050 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough Health Network
General Campus
Scarborough ON M1P 2V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-438-2911
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 318-3030 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough ON M1P 2T7
Phone: (416) 289-2166
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: GUAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Guan (CPSO#: 109295 )
Business Address: 3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Health Network
General Campus
Toronto Ontario M1P 2V5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JACK ZIJIE GUAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JACK ZIJIE GUAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016