THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 04:40:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 8300 York Regional Road 27
Woodbridge ON L4H 0R9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289 657 8703
Fax: 416 987 6132

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. Rai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jan 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Rai (CPSO#: 109297 )
Business Address: 8300 Highway 27
Woodbridge Ontario L4H 0R9
(289) 657-8703
Business Address: 50 Dr Kay Drive
Schomberg Ontario L0G 1T0
(905) 939-9111

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 8300 York Regional Road 27
Woodbridge ON L4H 0R9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289 657 8703
Fax: 416 987 6132

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. Rai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jan 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Rai (CPSO#: 109297 )
Business Address: 8300 Highway 27
Woodbridge Ontario L4H 0R9
(289) 657-8703
Business Address: 50 Dr Kay Drive
Schomberg Ontario L0G 1T0
(905) 939-9111

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAVJOT RAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAVJOT RAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016