THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:29:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Wishing Well Medical
12637 Tenth Line #104
Stouffville Ontario L4A 7X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 591-6060
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
North York General Hospital Toronto
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Lakeridge Health Clarington Site Bowmanville
Oak Valley Health - Uxbridge Hospital Uxbridge
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Clarington Site
LOCATION: Bowmanville

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health - Uxbridge Hospital
LOCATION: Uxbridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E. Yao Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Feb 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Yao (CPSO#: 109309 )
Business Address: Wishing Well Medical
12637 Tenth Line
Suite 104
Stouffville Ontario L4A 7X3
(905) 591-6060

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Wishing Well Medical
12637 Tenth Line #104
Stouffville Ontario L4A 7X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 591-6060
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
North York General Hospital Toronto
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Lakeridge Health Clarington Site Bowmanville
Oak Valley Health - Uxbridge Hospital Uxbridge
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Clarington Site
LOCATION: Bowmanville

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health - Uxbridge Hospital
LOCATION: Uxbridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E. Yao Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Feb 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Yao (CPSO#: 109309 )
Business Address: Wishing Well Medical
12637 Tenth Line
Suite 104
Stouffville Ontario L4A 7X3
(905) 591-6060

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FANGZHENG ERIK YAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FANGZHENG ERIK YAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016