THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:14:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 911 Queens Blvd
St. Mary's General Hospital
Division of Ophthalmology
Eye Clinic
Kitchener ON N2M 1B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 744-3311
Fax: (519) 208-8101
Address: 501-31 Kingsbury Dr
Kitchener ON N2A 0K5
Phone: (519) 208-8104
Fax: (519) 208-8101

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: CARL SHEN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Dec 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Shen (CPSO#: 109314 )
Business Address: 31 Kingsbury Drive
Unit 501
Kitchener Ontario N2A 0K5
519-208-8104

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 911 Queens Blvd
St. Mary's General Hospital
Division of Ophthalmology
Eye Clinic
Kitchener ON N2M 1B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 744-3311
Fax: (519) 208-8101
Address: 501-31 Kingsbury Dr
Kitchener ON N2A 0K5
Phone: (519) 208-8104
Fax: (519) 208-8101

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: CARL SHEN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Dec 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Shen (CPSO#: 109314 )
Business Address: 31 Kingsbury Drive
Unit 501
Kitchener Ontario N2A 0K5
519-208-8104

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CARL SHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CARL SHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Apr 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Apr 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016