THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:46:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 76 Grenville St
Women's College Hospital
Substance Use Service
3rd Floor
Toronto ON M5S 1B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-323-6400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marc Dagher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Apr 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Dagher (CPSO#: 109321 )
Business Address: True North Medical Centre
24 Dalhousie Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 2A5
Business Address: Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B3
(416) 323-6400
Business Address: WCH Family Practice Health Centre
77 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B3
(416) 323-6400
Business Address: 69 Queen Street East
Inner City Health Associates
Substance Use Hub
3rd floor
Toronto Ontario M5C 1R8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 76 Grenville St
Women's College Hospital
Substance Use Service
3rd Floor
Toronto ON M5S 1B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-323-6400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marc Dagher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Apr 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Dagher (CPSO#: 109321 )
Business Address: True North Medical Centre
24 Dalhousie Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 2A5
Business Address: Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B3
(416) 323-6400
Business Address: WCH Family Practice Health Centre
77 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B3
(416) 323-6400
Business Address: 69 Queen Street East
Inner City Health Associates
Substance Use Hub
3rd floor
Toronto Ontario M5C 1R8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARC DAGHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAGHER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARC DAGHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAGHER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Mar 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016