THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:54:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, VIETNAMESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 134 Wimberly Ave
Waterdown ON L8B 0S2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6479217551
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Huynh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jul 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Huynh (CPSO#: 109325 )
Business Address: 265 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K7K 0C5
(613) 969-7400
Business Address: 725 Bronte St S
Milton District Hospital
Emergency Department
Milton ON L9T 9K1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, VIETNAMESE
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 134 Wimberly Ave
Waterdown ON L8B 0S2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6479217551
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Huynh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jul 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Huynh (CPSO#: 109325 )
Business Address: 265 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K7K 0C5
(613) 969-7400
Business Address: 725 Bronte St S
Milton District Hospital
Emergency Department
Milton ON L9T 9K1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANDRA VO BAO LINH HUYNH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUYNH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANDRA VO BAO LINH HUYNH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUYNH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 May 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 May 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016