THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:46:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1800 8th St E
Owen Sound ON N4K 6M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-376-2121
Extension: 2535
Fax: 1-866-505-1121

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Mar 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 05 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital Southampton
Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site Wiarton
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Chesley Site Chesley
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital
LOCATION: Southampton

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site
LOCATION: Wiarton

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Chesley Site
LOCATION: Chesley

HOSPITAL: Hanover and District Hospital
LOCATION: Hanover

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kelly Fenn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Fenn (CPSO#: 109359 )
Business Address: 1800 8th St E
Owen Sound ON N4K 6M9
(519) 376-2121 Extn: 2535

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1800 8th St E
Owen Sound ON N4K 6M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-376-2121
Extension: 2535
Fax: 1-866-505-1121

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Mar 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 05 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital Southampton
Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site Wiarton
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Chesley Site Chesley
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital
LOCATION: Southampton

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site
LOCATION: Wiarton

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Chesley Site
LOCATION: Chesley

HOSPITAL: Hanover and District Hospital
LOCATION: Hanover

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kelly Fenn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Fenn (CPSO#: 109359 )
Business Address: 1800 8th St E
Owen Sound ON N4K 6M9
(519) 376-2121 Extn: 2535

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KELLY ELIZABETH FENN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FENN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KELLY ELIZABETH FENN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FENN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Mar 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016