THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:58:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 115 Delhi St
Guelph General Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
Guelph ON N1E 4J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6133162344
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 28 Aug 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 28 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. E. P. Harris Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Feb 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Harris (CPSO#: 109360 )
Business Address: 114 Dehli st
Guelph ON n1e 4j8
519 822 5350

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 115 Delhi St
Guelph General Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
Guelph ON N1E 4J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6133162344
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 28 Aug 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 28 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. E. P. Harris Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Feb 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Harris (CPSO#: 109360 )
Business Address: 114 Dehli st
Guelph ON n1e 4j8
519 822 5350

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMMA PENELOPE HARRIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARRIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMMA PENELOPE HARRIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARRIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016