THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:54:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1812 Sir Isaac Brock Way
Student Health Services
Brock University
St. Catharines ON L2S 3A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 688-5550
Extension: 3243
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 145 Queenston St
Quest Community Health Centre
St. Catharines ON L2R 2Z9
Phone: (905) 688-2558
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amanda Butera Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jan 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Butera (CPSO#: 109372 )
Business Address: 1812 Sir Isaac Brock Way
St Catharines ON L2S 3A1
(905) 688-5550 Extn: 3243

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1812 Sir Isaac Brock Way
Student Health Services
Brock University
St. Catharines ON L2S 3A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 688-5550
Extension: 3243
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 145 Queenston St
Quest Community Health Centre
St. Catharines ON L2R 2Z9
Phone: (905) 688-2558
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amanda Butera Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jan 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Butera (CPSO#: 109372 )
Business Address: 1812 Sir Isaac Brock Way
St Catharines ON L2S 3A1
(905) 688-5550 Extn: 3243

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMANDA ROSEANNA BUTERA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUTERA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMANDA ROSEANNA BUTERA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUTERA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016