THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:48:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1993
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Viva Health Centre,
9580 Yonge st.
Richmond Hill ON L4C 1V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9052378482
Fax: 9052378483
Address: 201 Georgian Dr
Royal Victoria Regional Health Center
Barrie ON L4M 6M2
Phone: 7057289802
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Oak Valley Health Markham
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sharifi Ghorveh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Jun 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Sharifi Ghorveh (CPSO#: 109377 )
Business Address: 9580 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 1V6
(905) 237-8482
Business Address: 56 King High Dr
Thornhill ON L4J 3N4
6479791392

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Viva Health Centre,
9580 Yonge st.
Richmond Hill ON L4C 1V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9052378482
Fax: 9052378483
Address: 201 Georgian Dr
Royal Victoria Regional Health Center
Barrie ON L4M 6M2
Phone: 7057289802
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Oak Valley Health Markham
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sharifi Ghorveh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Jun 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Sharifi Ghorveh (CPSO#: 109377 )
Business Address: 9580 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 1V6
(905) 237-8482
Business Address: 56 King High Dr
Thornhill ON L4J 3N4
6479791392

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FARANAK SHARIFI GHORVEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARIFI GHORVEH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FARANAK SHARIFI GHORVEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARIFI GHORVEH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 02 Sep 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 02 Sep 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Sep 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Sep 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Nov 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016