THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 05:13:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: James Cook University, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3030 Birchmount Rd
Physiatry Clinic
4th Floor
Scarborough ON M1W 3W3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-495-2558
Fax: 416-495-2581
Address: University Health Netowrk
Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
130 Dunn Ave
Toronto ON M6K 2R7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 114-5928 Finch Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1B 5P8
Phone: (416) 678-2911
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 08 Mar 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 08 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dhineskumar Sivananthan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Nov 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Sivananthan (CPSO#: 109378 )
Business Address: 3030 Birchmount Rd
Scarborough ON M1W 3W3
416-495-2558

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: James Cook University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3030 Birchmount Rd
Physiatry Clinic
4th Floor
Scarborough ON M1W 3W3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-495-2558
Fax: 416-495-2581
Address: University Health Netowrk
Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
130 Dunn Ave
Toronto ON M6K 2R7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 114-5928 Finch Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1B 5P8
Phone: (416) 678-2911
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 08 Mar 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 08 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dhineskumar Sivananthan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Nov 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Sivananthan (CPSO#: 109378 )
Business Address: 3030 Birchmount Rd
Scarborough ON M1W 3W3
416-495-2558

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DHINESKUMAR SIVANANTHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIVANANTHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DHINESKUMAR SIVANANTHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIVANANTHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: James Cook University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 May 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 May 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016