THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:10:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Uptown Eye Specialists
7900 Hurontario Street Unit 401
Brampton Ontario L6Y 0P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-292-0330
Extension: 1
Fax: 416-292-0331

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lili Tong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jul 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Tong (CPSO#: 109446 )
Business Address: 401-7900 Hurontario St
Brampton ON L6Y 0P6
416-292-0330 Extn: 1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Uptown Eye Specialists
7900 Hurontario Street Unit 401
Brampton Ontario L6Y 0P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-292-0330
Extension: 1
Fax: 416-292-0331

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lili Tong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jul 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Tong (CPSO#: 109446 )
Business Address: 401-7900 Hurontario St
Brampton ON L6Y 0P6
416-292-0330 Extn: 1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LILI TONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TONG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LILI TONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TONG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jul 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016