THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:50:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 541 Glenridge Ave
St. Catharines ON L2T 4C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-685-1381
Extension: 85306
Fax: 905-684-2377
Address: 388 Winston Road
Grimsby Ontario L3M 0H2
Phone: 2894382278
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 02 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 02 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: EMILY MILKO MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Milko (CPSO#: 109455 )
Business Address: 541 Glenridge Avenue
St. Catharines Ontario L2T 4C2
905-685-1381 Extn: 85306

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 541 Glenridge Ave
St. Catharines ON L2T 4C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-685-1381
Extension: 85306
Fax: 905-684-2377
Address: 388 Winston Road
Grimsby Ontario L3M 0H2
Phone: 2894382278
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 02 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 02 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: EMILY MILKO MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Milko (CPSO#: 109455 )
Business Address: 541 Glenridge Avenue
St. Catharines Ontario L2T 4C2
905-685-1381 Extn: 85306

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMILY JAYNE MILKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILKO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMILY JAYNE MILKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILKO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Mar 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Mar 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 03 Mar 2026

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016