THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:20:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-271 Cornwall Rd
Oakville Allergy and Asthma Specialists
Oakville ON L6J 7Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-337-2112
Fax: 289-351-3026
Address: 1-1280 Main St W
McMaster University Medical Centre
Hamilton ON L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 73928
Fax: (905) 521-4971
Address: 1-1280 Main St W
HSC 3V50
Hamilton ON L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 73928
Fax: (905) 521-4971

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Effective: 15 Oct 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology and Allergy
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 15 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Carol Saleh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Apr 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Saleh (CPSO#: 109457 )
Business Address: 1-6405 Erin Mills Pky
Mississauga ON L5N 4H4
Business Address: 271 Cornwall Road
Unit 201
Oakville Ontario L6J 3J1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-271 Cornwall Rd
Oakville Allergy and Asthma Specialists
Oakville ON L6J 7Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-337-2112
Fax: 289-351-3026
Address: 1-1280 Main St W
McMaster University Medical Centre
Hamilton ON L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 73928
Fax: (905) 521-4971
Address: 1-1280 Main St W
HSC 3V50
Hamilton ON L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 73928
Fax: (905) 521-4971

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Effective: 15 Oct 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology and Allergy
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 15 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Carol Saleh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Apr 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Saleh (CPSO#: 109457 )
Business Address: 1-6405 Erin Mills Pky
Mississauga ON L5N 4H4
Business Address: 271 Cornwall Road
Unit 201
Oakville Ontario L6J 3J1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAROL SALEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALEH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAROL SALEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALEH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Aug 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Aug 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 12 Aug 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Aug 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016