THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/05/25 04:40:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Orillia Soldiers' Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne St W
Orillia Ontario L3V2Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 325-2201
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Meaford General Hospital
229 Nelson St W
Meaford Ontario N4L1A3
Phone: 5195381331
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Grey Bruce Health Services Meaford Site Meaford
HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Meaford Site
LOCATION: Meaford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jacob J. Salituri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Aug 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Salituri (CPSO#: 109459 )
Business Address: 229 Nelson Street West
Meaford Ontario N4L 1A3
Business Address: 170 Colborne Street West
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Orillia Soldiers' Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne St W
Orillia Ontario L3V2Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 325-2201
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Meaford General Hospital
229 Nelson St W
Meaford Ontario N4L1A3
Phone: 5195381331
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Grey Bruce Health Services Meaford Site Meaford
HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Meaford Site
LOCATION: Meaford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jacob J. Salituri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Aug 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Salituri (CPSO#: 109459 )
Business Address: 229 Nelson Street West
Meaford Ontario N4L 1A3
Business Address: 170 Colborne Street West
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JACOB JOHN SALITURI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALITURI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JACOB JOHN SALITURI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALITURI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016