THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:45:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 399 Bathurst St
Toronto Western Hospital
Room 400 - 8th Floor East Wing
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-603-2581
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 02 Oct 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 02 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. DAVID FOX MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Dec 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Fox (CPSO#: 109482 )
Business Address: 715 - 20 Bruyeres Mews
Toronto ON M5V 0G8
Business Address: 399 Bathurst St
Toronto Western Hospital
Room 400 - 8th Floor East Wing
Toronto ON M5T 2S8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 399 Bathurst St
Toronto Western Hospital
Room 400 - 8th Floor East Wing
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-603-2581
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 02 Oct 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 02 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. DAVID FOX MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Dec 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Fox (CPSO#: 109482 )
Business Address: 715 - 20 Bruyeres Mews
Toronto ON M5V 0G8
Business Address: 399 Bathurst St
Toronto Western Hospital
Room 400 - 8th Floor East Wing
Toronto ON M5T 2S8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID DON FOX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FOX is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID DON FOX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FOX is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Jul 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 Jul 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 2016