THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:56:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Carol Davila Univ of Medicine & Pharmacy, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501 Smyth Rd
The Ottawa Hospital Cancer Centre
Radiation Oncology
Box # 902
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137377700
Extension: 70201
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: IONUT BUSCA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Feb 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Busca (CPSO#: 109485 )
Business Address: 610 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 2M9
4169462000
Business Address: 501 Smyth Rd
The Ottawa Hospital Cancer Centre
Radiation Oncology
Box # 902
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6

Corporation Name: Aurelia Busca Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Feb 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Busca (CPSO#: 100386 ) Dr. I. Busca (CPSO#: 109485 )
Business Address: Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Critical Care Wing
Room 4110
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 737-8899 Extn: 79041

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Carol Davila Univ of Medicine & Pharmacy, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501 Smyth Rd
The Ottawa Hospital Cancer Centre
Radiation Oncology
Box # 902
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137377700
Extension: 70201
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: IONUT BUSCA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Feb 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Busca (CPSO#: 109485 )
Business Address: 610 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 2M9
4169462000
Business Address: 501 Smyth Rd
The Ottawa Hospital Cancer Centre
Radiation Oncology
Box # 902
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6

Corporation Name: Aurelia Busca Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Feb 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Busca (CPSO#: 100386 ) Dr. I. Busca (CPSO#: 109485 )
Business Address: Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Critical Care Wing
Room 4110
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 737-8899 Extn: 79041

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IONUT LIVIU BUSCA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUSCA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IONUT LIVIU BUSCA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUSCA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Carol Davila Univ of Medicine & Pharmacy, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016