THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 05:38:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Lambeth Medical Clinic
2 - 3090 Colonel Talbot Rd
London Ontario N6P 0B3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-842-5705
Fax: 226-213-7001

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Gurland Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Mar 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Gurland (CPSO#: 109495 )
Business Address: 2-3090 Colonel Talbot Road
London Ontario N6P 0B3
(519) 842-5705

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Lambeth Medical Clinic
2 - 3090 Colonel Talbot Rd
London Ontario N6P 0B3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-842-5705
Fax: 226-213-7001

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Gurland Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Mar 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Gurland (CPSO#: 109495 )
Business Address: 2-3090 Colonel Talbot Road
London Ontario N6P 0B3
(519) 842-5705

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAUREN ALANA GURLAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GURLAND is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAUREN ALANA GURLAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GURLAND is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016