THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 04:52:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Thomas Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm St
St Thomas Ontario N5R 5C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 631-2020
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 09 Oct 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 09 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bluewater Health Sarnia
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. RORY PECA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Dec 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Peca (CPSO#: 109499 )
Business Address: 189 Elm St
St Thomas ON N5R 5C4
519-631-2030

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Thomas Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm St
St Thomas Ontario N5R 5C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 631-2020
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 09 Oct 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 09 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bluewater Health Sarnia
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. RORY PECA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Dec 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Peca (CPSO#: 109499 )
Business Address: 189 Elm St
St Thomas ON N5R 5C4
519-631-2030

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RORY LEE PECA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PECA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RORY LEE PECA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PECA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jan 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016