THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:00:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3045 Baseline Rd
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Department: Critical Care
Nepean ON K2H 8P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-721-2000
Extension: 2651
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 24 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: XU AND WEI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Aug 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. X. Xu (CPSO#: 109507 ) Dr. N. Wei (CPSO#: 106088 )
Business Address: 501 Smyth Rd
Box 210
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
613-737-8726
Business Address: 75 Charles St
Brockville ON K6V 1S8
613-345-5649
Business Address: 705 Mackay St
Pembroke ON K8A 1G8
613-732-2811
Business Address: 3045 Baseline Rd
Nepean ON K2H 8P4
613-721-2000
Business Address: 2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON M1E 4B9
416-284-8131
Business Address: 3050 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough ON M1P 2V5
416-438-2911
Business Address: 3030 Birchmount Rd
Scarborough ON M1W 3W3
416-4495-2400
Business Address: 3-665 Earl Armstrong Rd
Gloucester ON K1V 2G2
613-822-0411

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN
Medical School: McMaster University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3045 Baseline Rd
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Department: Critical Care
Nepean ON K2H 8P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-721-2000
Extension: 2651
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 24 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: XU AND WEI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Aug 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. X. Xu (CPSO#: 109507 ) Dr. N. Wei (CPSO#: 106088 )
Business Address: 501 Smyth Rd
Box 210
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
613-737-8726
Business Address: 75 Charles St
Brockville ON K6V 1S8
613-345-5649
Business Address: 705 Mackay St
Pembroke ON K8A 1G8
613-732-2811
Business Address: 3045 Baseline Rd
Nepean ON K2H 8P4
613-721-2000
Business Address: 2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON M1E 4B9
416-284-8131
Business Address: 3050 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough ON M1P 2V5
416-438-2911
Business Address: 3030 Birchmount Rd
Scarborough ON M1W 3W3
416-4495-2400
Business Address: 3-665 Earl Armstrong Rd
Gloucester ON K1V 2G2
613-822-0411

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. XINGNAN XU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. XU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. XINGNAN XU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. XU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016