THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:14:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2021
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 208-2300 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga ON L5M 2V8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056085040
Fax: 9056085041

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 15 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. DEREK LITTLE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jun 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Little (CPSO#: 109508 )
Business Address: 208-2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2V8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 208-2300 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga ON L5M 2V8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056085040
Fax: 9056085041

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 15 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. DEREK LITTLE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jun 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Little (CPSO#: 109508 )
Business Address: 208-2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2V8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEREK HENRY WALLACE LITTLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LITTLE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEREK HENRY WALLACE LITTLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LITTLE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2021

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Oct 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016