THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:19:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: suite 602b-581 Davis Drive
PACE Cardiology Medical Arts Building
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9059537917
Fax: 9059530046

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 19 Oct 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 19 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: PSG CARDIOLOGY MEDICAL PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Feb 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Grossman (CPSO#: 109510 )
Business Address: 137 Joanna Crescent
Vaughan Ontario L4J 5G3
4167313788

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: suite 602b-581 Davis Drive
PACE Cardiology Medical Arts Building
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9059537917
Fax: 9059530046

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 19 Oct 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 19 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: PSG CARDIOLOGY MEDICAL PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Feb 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Grossman (CPSO#: 109510 )
Business Address: 137 Joanna Crescent
Vaughan Ontario L4J 5G3
4167313788

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHOSHANA BLAKELY GROSSMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GROSSMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHOSHANA BLAKELY GROSSMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GROSSMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Nov 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016