THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:33:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Marathon Family Health Team
22 Peninsula Road
Box 399
Marathon Ontario P0T 2E0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 229-3243
Fax: (807) 229-2672
Address: Wilson Memorial General Hospital
26 Peninsula Road
Marathon Ontario P0T2E0
Phone: 8072291740
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Wilson Memorial General Hospital Marathon
HOSPITAL: Wilson Memorial General Hospital
LOCATION: Marathon

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Liliana F. DeMiglio Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. L. DeMiglio (CPSO#: 109524 )
Business Address: 22 Peninsula Road
Marathon Ontario P0T 2E0
(807) 229-3243
Business Address: 26 Peninsula Road
Marathon Ontario P0T 2E0
(807) 229-1740

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Marathon Family Health Team
22 Peninsula Road
Box 399
Marathon Ontario P0T 2E0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 229-3243
Fax: (807) 229-2672
Address: Wilson Memorial General Hospital
26 Peninsula Road
Marathon Ontario P0T2E0
Phone: 8072291740
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Wilson Memorial General Hospital Marathon
HOSPITAL: Wilson Memorial General Hospital
LOCATION: Marathon

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Liliana F. DeMiglio Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. L. DeMiglio (CPSO#: 109524 )
Business Address: 22 Peninsula Road
Marathon Ontario P0T 2E0
(807) 229-3243
Business Address: 26 Peninsula Road
Marathon Ontario P0T 2E0
(807) 229-1740

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LILIANA FRANCA DEMIGLIO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEMIGLIO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LILIANA FRANCA DEMIGLIO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEMIGLIO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016