THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:13:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 310 Bridge Street West
Napanee Ontario K7R 0A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-354-8238
Fax: 1 855 437 1473

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
HOSPITAL: Lennox and Addington County General Hospital
LOCATION: Napanee

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. Hart Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Dec 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Hart (CPSO#: 109528 )
Business Address: H1-310 Bridge St W
Napanee ON K7R 0A4
1-613-354-8238

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 310 Bridge Street West
Napanee Ontario K7R 0A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-354-8238
Fax: 1 855 437 1473

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
HOSPITAL: Lennox and Addington County General Hospital
LOCATION: Napanee

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. Hart Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Dec 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Hart (CPSO#: 109528 )
Business Address: H1-310 Bridge St W
Napanee ON K7R 0A4
1-613-354-8238

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. C NATHANIEL HART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HART is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. C NATHANIEL HART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HART is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016