THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:53:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1245 Lakeshore Rd
Burlington ON L7S 0A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 200 Terrace Hill St
Brantford ON N3R 1G9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 18 May 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 18 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brantford General Hospital Brantford
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Brantford General Hospital
LOCATION: Brantford

HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gurneet Thiara Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Apr 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Thiara (CPSO#: 109530 )
Business Address: 1245 Lakeshore Rd
Burlington ON L7S 0A2
905-632-3737 Extn: 3401

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1245 Lakeshore Rd
Burlington ON L7S 0A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 200 Terrace Hill St
Brantford ON N3R 1G9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 18 May 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 18 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brantford General Hospital Brantford
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Brantford General Hospital
LOCATION: Brantford

HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gurneet Thiara Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Apr 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Thiara (CPSO#: 109530 )
Business Address: 1245 Lakeshore Rd
Burlington ON L7S 0A2
905-632-3737 Extn: 3401

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GURNEET SINGH THIARA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THIARA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GURNEET SINGH THIARA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THIARA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016