THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:19:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Casselman Medical Centre
629 Principale St.
Casselman Ontario K0A 1M0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 764-5440
Fax: (613)764-9974

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: GOLBAFIAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Dec 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Golbafian (CPSO#: 109533 )
Business Address: 629 Rue Principale
Casselman ON K0A 1M0
613-764-5440
Business Address: 595 Montreal Rd
Suite 400
Ottawa ON K1K 4L2
613-695-6900

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Casselman Medical Centre
629 Principale St.
Casselman Ontario K0A 1M0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 764-5440
Fax: (613)764-9974

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: GOLBAFIAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Dec 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Golbafian (CPSO#: 109533 )
Business Address: 629 Rue Principale
Casselman ON K0A 1M0
613-764-5440
Business Address: 595 Montreal Rd
Suite 400
Ottawa ON K1K 4L2
613-695-6900

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FAEGHEH GOLBAFIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLBAFIAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FAEGHEH GOLBAFIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLBAFIAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016