THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:09:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3030 Birchmount Rd
Scarborough ON M1W 3W3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164952400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 339-291 Windermere Rd
London ON N6G 2J9
Phone: 5196858500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zain Burhani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Apr 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Burhani (CPSO#: 109534 )
Business Address: 3030 Birchmount Rd
Scarborough ON M1W 3W3
6479374806
Business Address: 339-291 Windermere Rd
London ON N6G 2J9
519-685-8500

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3030 Birchmount Rd
Scarborough ON M1W 3W3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164952400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 339-291 Windermere Rd
London ON N6G 2J9
Phone: 5196858500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zain Burhani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Apr 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Burhani (CPSO#: 109534 )
Business Address: 3030 Birchmount Rd
Scarborough ON M1W 3W3
6479374806
Business Address: 339-291 Windermere Rd
London ON N6G 2J9
519-685-8500

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZAIN BURHANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURHANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZAIN BURHANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURHANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016