THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:20:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 204 6th Avenue
Lively Ontario P3Y 1M4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 6924774
Fax: (705) 419-2302
Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1280 Lasalle Blvd
Sudbury Ontario P3A 1Y8
Phone: 705-222-1364
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1140 South Bay Rd
Sudbury Ontario P3E 0B6
Phone: 705-674-2846
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Continuing Care Centre Sudbury Sudbury
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Continuing Care Centre Sudbury
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rose Michael Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jul 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Michael (CPSO#: 109540 )
Business Address: 204 6th Avenue
Lively Ontario P3Y 1M4
Business Address: 25 Black Lake Road
Lively Ontario P3Y 1J3
(705) 692-1018
Business Address: 202-1280 Lasalle Boulevard
Sudbury Ontario P3A 1Y8
(705) 522-3380
Business Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Business Address: 80 Elm Street
Sudbury Ontario P3C 1T2
(705) 522-3380

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 204 6th Avenue
Lively Ontario P3Y 1M4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 6924774
Fax: (705) 419-2302
Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1280 Lasalle Blvd
Sudbury Ontario P3A 1Y8
Phone: 705-222-1364
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1140 South Bay Rd
Sudbury Ontario P3E 0B6
Phone: 705-674-2846
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Continuing Care Centre Sudbury Sudbury
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Continuing Care Centre Sudbury
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rose Michael Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jul 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Michael (CPSO#: 109540 )
Business Address: 204 6th Avenue
Lively Ontario P3Y 1M4
Business Address: 25 Black Lake Road
Lively Ontario P3Y 1J3
(705) 692-1018
Business Address: 202-1280 Lasalle Boulevard
Sudbury Ontario P3A 1Y8
(705) 522-3380
Business Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Business Address: 80 Elm Street
Sudbury Ontario P3C 1T2
(705) 522-3380

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROSE JEANNE MARIE MICHAEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MICHAEL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROSE JEANNE MARIE MICHAEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MICHAEL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016