THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:23:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 522 1155
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 50 Charlton Ave E
St. Joseph's Healthcare
Department of Emergency Medicine
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 50 Charlton Ave E
St. Joseph's Healthcare
Emergency Department
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Phone: 905 522 1155
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
Emergency Department
Maple ON L6A 4Z3
Phone: 905-417-2000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 10 Trench St
Mackenzie Health
Emergency Department
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
Phone: 905-883-1212
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. FARAH JAZULI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Jazuli (CPSO#: 109566 )
Business Address: 10 Trench St
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
Business Address: 50 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Business Address: 100 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8
Business Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Maple ON L6A 4Z3
Business Address: 237 Barton St E
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 522 1155
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 50 Charlton Ave E
St. Joseph's Healthcare
Department of Emergency Medicine
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 50 Charlton Ave E
St. Joseph's Healthcare
Emergency Department
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Phone: 905 522 1155
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
Emergency Department
Maple ON L6A 4Z3
Phone: 905-417-2000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 10 Trench St
Mackenzie Health
Emergency Department
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
Phone: 905-883-1212
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. FARAH JAZULI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Jazuli (CPSO#: 109566 )
Business Address: 10 Trench St
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
Business Address: 50 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Business Address: 100 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8
Business Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Maple ON L6A 4Z3
Business Address: 237 Barton St E
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FARAH JAZULI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAZULI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FARAH JAZULI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAZULI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016