THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:53:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 561 Eglinton Ave W
Watson Medical Clinic
Toronto ON M5N 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 551-7606
Fax: (647) 689-2012

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Auspitz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Dec 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Auspitz (CPSO#: 109569 )
Business Address: Watson Medical Clinic
561 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M5N 1B5
(416) 551-7606

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 561 Eglinton Ave W
Watson Medical Clinic
Toronto ON M5N 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 551-7606
Fax: (647) 689-2012

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Auspitz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Dec 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Auspitz (CPSO#: 109569 )
Business Address: Watson Medical Clinic
561 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M5N 1B5
(416) 551-7606

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK AUSPITZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AUSPITZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK AUSPITZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AUSPITZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016