THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:19:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto General Hospital
Division of Cardiology
6EN-246
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-340-4800
Extension: 3811
Fax: 416-340-3615

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 23 Oct 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 23 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority Moose Factory
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Area Health Authority
LOCATION: Moose Factory

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. MENA GEWARGES MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jul 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gewarges (CPSO#: 109571 )
Business Address: 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto General Hospital
Division of Cardiology
6EN-246
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto General Hospital
Division of Cardiology
6EN-246
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-340-4800
Extension: 3811
Fax: 416-340-3615

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 23 Oct 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 23 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority Moose Factory
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Area Health Authority
LOCATION: Moose Factory

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. MENA GEWARGES MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jul 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gewarges (CPSO#: 109571 )
Business Address: 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto General Hospital
Division of Cardiology
6EN-246
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MENA GEWARGES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GEWARGES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MENA GEWARGES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GEWARGES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016