THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:16:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Centre for Family Medicine- University Gates Site
250 Laurelwood Drive, Suite 4111
Waterloo ON N2J 0E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-904-0656
Fax: 519-904-0658
Address: Brierwood Gardens Long Term Care
425 Park Rd N
Brantford ON N3R 7G5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. Joseph's Lifecare Centre
99 Wayne Gretzky Pkwy
Brantford Ontario N3S 6T6
Phone: 519-751-7096
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hillside Manor
5066 Line 34 R.R.#5
Stratford Ontario N5A 6S6
Phone: 519-393-5132
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 250 Laurelwood Drive, Suite 4111
Waterloo Ontario N2J 0E2
Phone: 519-904-0656
Fax: 519-904-0658

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Saurabh Kalra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Jul 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kalra (CPSO#: 109573 )
Business Address: 425 Park Road North
Brantford Ontario N3R 7G5
(519) 759-1040
Business Address: 250 Laurelwood Dr
Suite 4111
Waterloo ON N2J 0E2
519-904-0656

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Centre for Family Medicine- University Gates Site
250 Laurelwood Drive, Suite 4111
Waterloo ON N2J 0E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-904-0656
Fax: 519-904-0658
Address: Brierwood Gardens Long Term Care
425 Park Rd N
Brantford ON N3R 7G5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. Joseph's Lifecare Centre
99 Wayne Gretzky Pkwy
Brantford Ontario N3S 6T6
Phone: 519-751-7096
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hillside Manor
5066 Line 34 R.R.#5
Stratford Ontario N5A 6S6
Phone: 519-393-5132
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 250 Laurelwood Drive, Suite 4111
Waterloo Ontario N2J 0E2
Phone: 519-904-0656
Fax: 519-904-0658

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Saurabh Kalra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Jul 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kalra (CPSO#: 109573 )
Business Address: 425 Park Road North
Brantford Ontario N3R 7G5
(519) 759-1040
Business Address: 250 Laurelwood Dr
Suite 4111
Waterloo ON N2J 0E2
519-904-0656

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAURABH KALRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KALRA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAURABH KALRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KALRA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016