THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/05/25 05:15:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mount Sinai Family Health Team
60 Murray Street
4th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5T 3L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-586-4800
Extension: 5160
Fax: 416-586-3175

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L HERZOG MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Oct 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Herzog (CPSO#: 109582 )
Business Address: 60 Murray St
4th Floor
Toronto ON M5T 3L9
416-586-5158

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mount Sinai Family Health Team
60 Murray Street
4th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5T 3L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-586-4800
Extension: 5160
Fax: 416-586-3175

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L HERZOG MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Oct 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Herzog (CPSO#: 109582 )
Business Address: 60 Murray St
4th Floor
Toronto ON M5T 3L9
416-586-5158

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LINDSAY SAMANTHA HERZOG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERZOG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LINDSAY SAMANTHA HERZOG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERZOG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016